House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2346
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1089
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 895
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 137
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 137
|
Senate
|
12/19/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|