Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR27 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill December 19, 2016

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill April 3, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2017
Bill March 22, 2017