House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 3152 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3152 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1211 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1211 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1211 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1211 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1210 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1210 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1210 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 293 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 293 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |