Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR36 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Perry S.J.R. No. 36
 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2017; February 15, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water &
 Rural Affairs; April 6, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 6, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting a tax on the sale
 or purchase of water at wholesale.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 31 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.  A tax may not be imposed on the sale or purchase of
 water at wholesale.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2017, prohibiting the imposition of a tax on the
 sale or purchase of water at wholesale.
 (b)  If the 85th Legislature, during the regular or a special
 session, enacts a law imposing or authorizing a tax prohibited by
 Section 31, Article VIII, of this constitution, the portion of the
 law that violates that section expires January 1, 2019.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires December 31, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment prohibiting a tax on
 the sale or purchase of water at wholesale."
 * * * * *