By: Perry S.J.R. No. 36 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2017; February 15, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; April 6, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 6, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting a tax on the sale or purchase of water at wholesale. BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by adding Section 31 to read as follows: Sec. 31. A tax may not be imposed on the sale or purchase of water at wholesale. SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to the Texas Constitution: TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, prohibiting the imposition of a tax on the sale or purchase of water at wholesale. (b) If the 85th Legislature, during the regular or a special session, enacts a law imposing or authorizing a tax prohibited by Section 31, Article VIII, of this constitution, the portion of the law that violates that section expires January 1, 2019. (c) This temporary provision expires December 31, 2019. SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017. The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the proposition: "The constitutional amendment prohibiting a tax on the sale or purchase of water at wholesale." * * * * *