E
|
05/16/2017
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3486
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3389
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#624
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1426
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 530
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 395
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 351
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Adopted as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 351
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Taylor of Collin
|
Journal Page: 351
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 351
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 351
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 351
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 350
|
Senate
|
02/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 341
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 327
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 311
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 278
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 278
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|