Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR114 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/06/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 114
 In Memory
 of
 Marion Violet Laffoon
 WHEREAS, Marion Violet Laffoon of Chandler passed away on
 June 19, 2016, at the age of 74, leaving her circle of family and
 friends to cherish their many happy memories of time spent in her
 company; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Edgar and Ola Wills, the former
 Marion Wills was born in Ashdown, Arkansas, on August 31, 1941,
 and grew up with the companionship of five sisters; she was
 joined in marriage to John Laffoon on January 7, 1973, and the
 couple enjoyed more than four decades together; they were
 blessed with a treasured family that included two daughters,
 Donna and Diana, as well as four granddaughters and eight
 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to her Christian faith, Mrs.
 Laffoon was a valued congregant of Faith Baptist Church; in her
 leisure time, she delighted in fishing, and she collected angel
 and frog figurines, which she displayed in her home; and
 WHEREAS, Marion Laffoon lived a rich and purposeful life
 centered around her faith and her family, and she will long be
 remembered with deep affection by all who had the good fortune to
 know her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Marion Violet
 Laffoon and extend sincere condolences to the members of her
 family:  to her husband, John Laffoon; to her daughters, Donna
 Mansfield and her husband, Steve, and Diana Turner and her
 husband, Roland; to her sisters, Kathryn Phelps, Edna Reyenga,
 Patsy Grooms, and Gladys Brown; to her granddaughters, Denise
 Harned, April Read, Arion Crater, and Katie Turner; to her
 great-grandchildren, Corey Bonner, Ian, Guyson, and Branson
 Harned, Jathan Pridgen, and Natalee, Addison, and Mackenzie
 Crater; to her nieces and nephews; and to her other relatives and
 many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this day, it do
 so in memory of Marion Laffoon.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 6, 2017, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate