SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 210 WHEREAS, In the late 19th and early 20th centuries, educators and business and political leaders recognized a need for practical, hands-on vocational education programs to augment the traditional study of classical academic subjects; and WHEREAS, United States Senator Hoke Smith, following the recommendations of the Commission on National Aid to Vocational Education, introduced S. 703 on December 7, 1915; Representative Dudley Hughes laid out a companion bill, HB 11250, on February 10, 1916; these initiatives received bipartisan support in Congress, and the Smith-Hughes Act was signed into law by President Woodrow Wilson on February 23, 1917; and WHEREAS, This landmark legislation granted financial support to the states with the autonomy to develop career and technical education systems; today, 15 million American students participate in some form of vocational education in 16 cutting-edge career areas, and more than one million of those are Texans; and WHEREAS, In addition, as a result of the Smith-Hughes National Vocational Education Act, numerous outstanding youth leadership development organizations such as the Future Business Leaders of America, the National FFA Organization, and SkillsUSA, were established and became vital additions to vocational educational programs; it is truly fitting that the impetus behind these exceptional programs receive special recognition; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th Legislature, hereby proclaim February 23, 2017, as Smith-Hughes Day and call on Texans to join Americans across the nation in supporting the educators and programs that help prepare young people to become productive, contributing members of society; and, be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared in honor of this special occasion. Kolkhorst ________________________________ President of the Senate I hereby certify that the above Resolution was adopted by the Senate on February 15, 2017. ________________________________ Secretary of the Senate ________________________________ Member, Texas Senate