Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR210 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/15/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 210
 WHEREAS, In the late 19th and early 20th centuries,
 educators and business and political leaders recognized a need
 for practical, hands-on vocational education programs to augment
 the traditional study of classical academic subjects; and
 WHEREAS, United States Senator Hoke Smith, following the
 recommendations of the Commission on National Aid to Vocational
 Education, introduced S. 703 on December 7, 1915; Representative
 Dudley Hughes laid out a companion bill, HB 11250, on February
 10, 1916; these initiatives received bipartisan support in
 Congress, and the Smith-Hughes Act was signed into law by
 President Woodrow Wilson on February 23, 1917; and
 WHEREAS, This landmark legislation granted financial
 support to the states with the autonomy to develop career and
 technical education systems; today, 15 million American students
 participate in some form of vocational education in 16
 cutting-edge career areas, and more than one million of those are
 Texans; and
 WHEREAS, In addition, as a result of the Smith-Hughes
 National Vocational Education Act, numerous outstanding youth
 leadership development organizations such as the Future Business
 Leaders of America, the National FFA Organization, and
 SkillsUSA, were established and became vital additions to
 vocational educational programs; it is truly fitting that the
 impetus behind these exceptional programs receive special
 recognition; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby proclaim February 23, 2017, as Smith-Hughes
 Day and call on Texans to join Americans across the nation in
 supporting the educators and programs that help prepare young
 people to become productive, contributing members of society;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared in
 honor of this special occasion.
 Kolkhorst
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 15, 2017.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate