Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR225 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/21/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 225
 In Memory
 of
 Cecil Ira Hollingshead
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Cecil
 Ira Hollingshead of Marshall, who passed away on December 11,
 2016, at the age of 96; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Mont Belvieu on April 10, 1920, Cecil
 Hollingshead was the son of Henry and Barsa Hollingshead; he
 joined the United States Navy in 1938 and was stationed at Pearl
 Harbor; when the Japanese attacked on December 7, 1941, he began
 handing out machine guns, and with his fellow sailors, he
 succeeded in bringing down two enemy aircraft; he subsequently
 helped seize Pacific islands for the Allied forces with a
 squadron of seagoing bombers; highly decorated, he earned the
 American Defense Service Medal, American Campaign Medal,
 Asiatic-Pacific Campaign Medal, Good Conduct Medal, World War II
 Victory Medal, and, in 1991, the commemorative Pearl Harbor
 Medal; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hollingshead married the love of his life, the
 former Beatrice Ruth Schmitz, on October 5, 1945, and they became
 the parents of four children, James, Paul, Daniel, and Cecilia;
 through the years, Mr. Hollingshead knew the joy of welcoming
 into his family 10 grandchildren, Kimberly, Adrienne, Tiffannee,
 Jared, Jonathon, Harold, Joshua, Jennifer, Stormy, and Holly, as
 well as 23 great-grandchildren and 2 great-great-grandchildren;
 he and his wife shared a fulfilling marriage of 66 years before
 her death; and
 WHEREAS, After the war, Mr. Hollingshead completed his
 bachelor's degree in mechanical and electrical engineering at
 the University of Houston; he performed design work for the B-52
 bomber while employed by Boeing in Seattle, and in 1956, he
 relocated to Marshall and embarked on a career with Thiokol that
 would span nearly three decades; following his retirement, he
 continued to work as a cattle rancher and custom hay baler; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hollingshead was a devout Catholic, and he
 served the Knights of Columbus Marshall Council for 57 years; as
 a nonagenarian, he spent many happy days camping, golfing, and
 fishing, and shortly before his death, he traveled to Pearl
 Harbor to participate in the 75th anniversary observance; and
 WHEREAS, Cecil Hollingshead lived a rich and purposeful
 life devoted to his family, his faith, and his country, and he
 leaves behind a legacy that will long be treasured by all those
 who held him dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Cecil Ira
 Hollingshead and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn his
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this day, it do
 so in memory of Cecil Hollingshead.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 21, 2017,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate