SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 225 In Memory of Cecil Ira Hollingshead WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Cecil Ira Hollingshead of Marshall, who passed away on December 11, 2016, at the age of 96; and WHEREAS, Born in Mont Belvieu on April 10, 1920, Cecil Hollingshead was the son of Henry and Barsa Hollingshead; he joined the United States Navy in 1938 and was stationed at Pearl Harbor; when the Japanese attacked on December 7, 1941, he began handing out machine guns, and with his fellow sailors, he succeeded in bringing down two enemy aircraft; he subsequently helped seize Pacific islands for the Allied forces with a squadron of seagoing bombers; highly decorated, he earned the American Defense Service Medal, American Campaign Medal, Asiatic-Pacific Campaign Medal, Good Conduct Medal, World War II Victory Medal, and, in 1991, the commemorative Pearl Harbor Medal; and WHEREAS, Mr. Hollingshead married the love of his life, the former Beatrice Ruth Schmitz, on October 5, 1945, and they became the parents of four children, James, Paul, Daniel, and Cecilia; through the years, Mr. Hollingshead knew the joy of welcoming into his family 10 grandchildren, Kimberly, Adrienne, Tiffannee, Jared, Jonathon, Harold, Joshua, Jennifer, Stormy, and Holly, as well as 23 great-grandchildren and 2 great-great-grandchildren; he and his wife shared a fulfilling marriage of 66 years before her death; and WHEREAS, After the war, Mr. Hollingshead completed his bachelor's degree in mechanical and electrical engineering at the University of Houston; he performed design work for the B-52 bomber while employed by Boeing in Seattle, and in 1956, he relocated to Marshall and embarked on a career with Thiokol that would span nearly three decades; following his retirement, he continued to work as a cattle rancher and custom hay baler; and WHEREAS, Mr. Hollingshead was a devout Catholic, and he served the Knights of Columbus Marshall Council for 57 years; as a nonagenarian, he spent many happy days camping, golfing, and fishing, and shortly before his death, he traveled to Pearl Harbor to participate in the 75th anniversary observance; and WHEREAS, Cecil Hollingshead lived a rich and purposeful life devoted to his family, his faith, and his country, and he leaves behind a legacy that will long be treasured by all those who held him dear; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Cecil Ira Hollingshead and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn his passing; and, be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Cecil Hollingshead. Hughes ________________________________ President of the Senate I hereby certify that the above Resolution was adopted by the Senate on February 21, 2017, by a rising vote. ________________________________ Secretary of the Senate ________________________________ Member, Texas Senate