Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR34 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/23/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 34
 In Memory
 of
 Bette-Jo Simpson Buhler
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Bette-Jo Simpson Buhler, who died
 January 9, 2017, at the age of 95; and
 WHEREAS, Bette-Jo Simpson was born on May 2, 1921, in
 Olympia, Washington, to Blanche Taylor and Jess Ray Simpson; she
 graduated from the Annie Wright School in Tacoma and from the
 University of Washington; and
 WHEREAS, She married the late Frank Sibley Buhler Jr. on
 July 7, 1942, and the couple moved to Victoria, Texas, in 1948;
 she was blessed with five children, 13 grandchildren, and 17
 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Buhler played a major role in building the
 Republican Party in Texas; she was instrumental in helping John
 Tower become the first Republican from Texas to be elected a
 United States senator, and she was a founding member of the
 Associated Republicans of Texas; she served as cochair of the
 Texas Republican Party and was named the 2001 Republican of the
 Year by the National Republican Congressional Committee; and
 WHEREAS, She was also active in a wide range of community
 and philanthropic organizations; she was a sustaining member of
 the Victoria Junior League, and she helped establish Trinity
 Episcopal School and served as chair of the board of the Victoria
 Youth Activity Committee; and
 WHEREAS, She helped to organize the Gulf Bend Center and
 was actively involved with the Victoria Symphony, the Lionel
 Hampton International Jazz Festival, and the Texas State
 University System Foundation; and
 WHEREAS, A woman of courage, strength, and compassion, she
 gave unselfishly to others, and her generous spirit, her wise
 counsel, and her enthusiasm for living each day to the fullest
 will not be forgotten; and
 WHEREAS, She was a devoted wife, mother, and grandmother,
 and she leaves behind memories that will be treasured forever by
 her family and many friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Bette-Jo Simpson Buhler; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Bette-Jo Simpson Buhler.
 Kolkhorst
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 23, 2017, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate