Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR402 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/09/2017

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 402
 In Memory
 of
 Jack Pope
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins citizens
 across the state in mourning the loss of the Honorable Jack Pope,
 a beloved and revered citizen who died on February 25, 2017, at
 the age of 103; and
 WHEREAS, Jack Pope was born on April 18, 1913, in Abilene,
 and graduated from the Abilene public school system; in 1934,
 he earned a bachelor of arts degree from Abilene Christian
 University, and in 1937, he earned a law degree from The
 University of Texas at Austin, where he was editor of the Texas
 Law Review; and
 WHEREAS, While in Austin, Jack met Allene Nichols, a fellow
 recent graduate; they married on June 11, 1938, and they soon
 moved to Corpus Christi; Jack began practicing law with his
 uncle, W. E. Pope, but like so many patriots, he postponed his
 career to serve his country during World War II; he joined the
 United States Navy and served with distinction as a cryptologist
 in Washington, D.C.; and
 WHEREAS, In 1964, he was elected to the Texas Supreme Court,
 and in 1982, Governor Bill Clements appointed him chief justice
 of the Texas Supreme Court; Justice Pope presided on the bench
 for 38 years and is among the longest-serving judges on the state's
 high courts; and
 WHEREAS, Among his many accomplishments on the bench,
 Justice Pope initiated new procedures for handling grievances
 against attorneys, promulgated the Texas Rules of Judicial
 Education, wrote the first jury handbook, and sponsored the
 creation of the Texas State Law Library; he worked with judicial
 colleagues to establish an Interest on Lawyers Trust Accounts
 program, which provides civil legal services to more than 100,000
 poor families across Texas, and he was also considered an expert
 on matters of complex water laws in Texas and the southwestern
 United States; and
 WHEREAS, After he retired, he developed the Jack Pope Fellows
 Program at Abilene Christian University to provide scholarships
 to students interested in careers in public service; he has been
 honored as an Outstanding Alumnus of both Abilene Christian
 University and The University of Texas at Austin, and in 2010,
 the State Bar of Texas honored him with the Lifetime Achievement
 Award; and
 WHEREAS, Above all things, Jack prioritized matters of
 family; he shared 66 years of marriage with Allene, and he built
 on to their home to take care of his in-laws after Allene's father
 suffered a stroke; Jack was blessed with two children, three
 grandchildren, and four great-grandchildren, who were a source
 of immense pride and joy; and
 WHEREAS, Jack Pope was a highly respected member of the
 community, and he made immeasurable contributions to the Texas
 Judicial System; in 2014, the Texas Supreme Court Historical
 Society published Common Law Judge:  Selected Writings of Chief
 Justice Jack Pope of Texas, a collection of essays and opinions
 and a biography of this truly distinguished Texan who has left
 behind a proud and lasting legacy in the Lone Star State; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Jack Pope; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Jack Pope.
 Watson
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 9, 2017, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate