Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR652 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/20/2017

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 652
 In Memory
 of
 Romeo L. Lomas
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Romeo L. Lomas, a beloved civic leader,
 who died April 6, 2017, at the age of 79; and
 WHEREAS, Romeo Lomas was born on September 3, 1937, in
 Kingsville, Texas; he was a man of wisdom, integrity, and
 compassion, and he had a fulfilling life of service on behalf of
 the citizens of Kleberg County as one of the county's
 longest-serving politicians; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Lomas was a distinguished veteran of the
 United States Army, and he served as a Kleberg County
 commissioner for 38 years; as commissioner, he advocated for wage
 increases and improvement of benefits for the county's public
 employees, and he continually strived to increase opportunities
 and support services for vulnerable residents; his many
 accomplishments included playing an instrumental role in the
 creation of the Kleberg County Human Services department and of a
 senior center; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Lomas made it his lifelong mission to be a
 voice for all the citizens of Kleberg County, and he was a
 champion of the underserved members of the community he loved; he
 retired as Kleberg County Commissioner on December 31, 2016, and
 he continued to serve as a mentor for local residents and
 community leaders; and
 WHEREAS, Romeo Lomas was a devoted husband, father, and
 grandfather and was beloved by many, and he will long be
 remembered with respect and admiration by all who were privileged
 to share in his life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Romeo L. Lomas; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Romeo Lomas.
 Lucio
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 20, 2017, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate