Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR905 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2017

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 905
 In Memory
 of
 David Irvine Rucker
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever feel the loss of
 Texas Department of Public Safety Trooper David Irvine Rucker,
 who died in the line of duty on September 29, 1981, at the age of
 37; and
 WHEREAS, Trooper Rucker was shot and killed during the
 course of a traffic stop; he left behind a wife and three
 children; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Brownsville on October 21, 1943, David
 Rucker was the son of Bracht and Hazel Dawn Rucker; he grew up in
 Homestead, Florida, where he graduated from South Dade High
 School in 1963; he studied liberal arts at Texas Southmost
 College in Brownsville and went on to graduate from the Dade
 County Police Academy; from 1966 to 1968, he served as a patrol
 officer in the Homestead Police Department; and
 WHEREAS, On September 15, 1969, Mr. Rucker took the oath of
 the Texas State Highway Patrol; he was appointed patrolman in
 1973, and that same year, he was promoted to patrolman II; at the
 time of his death, he was assigned to Region 3 in Port Isabel; and
 WHEREAS, In 1997, a memorial was placed at the site of
 Trooper Rucker's death, and a street was renamed in his honor in
 Isla Blanca Park on South Padre Island; the Carrizales-Rucker
 Detention Center near Olmito bears his name, and in 2012, the
 Texas Department of Public Safety named a river patrol boat in
 Trooper Rucker's memory; and
 WHEREAS, Though David Rucker was taken far too soon, his
 legacy of public service and devotion to his family will continue
 to inspire all those who hold him close in their hearts; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of David Irvine
 Rucker and extend heartfelt sympathy to his family and many
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this day, it do
 so in memory of David Irvine Rucker.
 Lucio
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 26, 2017, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate