Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR951 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2017

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 951
 In Memory
 of
 Elouise Jacquelyn Clark McLemore
 WHEREAS, A full and productive life drew to a close with
 the passing of retired educator Elouise Jacquelyn Clark McLemore
 of Houston on May 20, 2017, at the age of 90; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of James L. Clark Sr. and Lola Belle
 Robinson Clark, the former Elouise Clark was born in Sunnyside in
 Waller County on November 6, 1926; she graduated as valedictorian
 of Booker T. Washington High School in Houston and went on to
 complete her bachelor's degree cum laude at Prairie View A&M
 University; on December 21, 1947, she married her best friend,
 Stephen Dan "SD" McLemore, and they became the proud parents of
 five children, Darrizett, Allison, Jacquelyn, Stephen, and
 Tracey; over the years, she knew the joy of welcoming into her
 family six grandchildren, Chelette, Dequina, Stephen, Jimmy,
 Nicole, and Justice, and four great-grandchildren, Kiera, Zara,
 Daneea, and Stephen; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. McLemore began her 45-year career in
 education in the Baytown public schools and later joined the
 Houston Independent School District; in her classroom, she was a
 force to be reckoned with, maintaining a calm, positive
 environment for learning; she was dedicated to her students and
 spent most of her evenings working with children to ensure that
 they had fully grasped mathematical concepts and would retain
 them; and
 WHEREAS, A woman of strong faith, Mrs. McLemore was a
 longtime member of Sheeler Memorial CME Church and gave
 selflessly of her time and talents in numerous capacities,
 including secretary of the Morning Glory Circle and the Epworth
 League and lead soloist in the choir; she also developed
 children's programs; in addition, she belonged to Metropolitan
 CME Church and sang in its choir; she volunteered for three
 decades as a member of Les Famille Social Club; and
 WHEREAS, Elouise McLemore will be deeply missed, but
 memories of her grace, generosity, warmth, and charm remain to
 comfort and inspire those she leaves behind; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Elouise Jacquelyn
 Clark McLemore and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn
 her passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this day, it do
 so in memory of Elouise McLemore.
 Miles
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 29, 2017, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate