Senate | 08/03/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 08/03/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 07/31/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Passed | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 07/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 07/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 07/27/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 07/26/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 07/26/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 07/26/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 07/19/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 07/19/2017 | Filed |