Senate | 08/07/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 08/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 08/04/2017 | Passed | ||
House | 08/04/2017 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 08/04/2017 | Amendment fails of adoption | ||
House | 08/04/2017 | Point of order overruled (amendment) | ||
House | 08/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 08/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 08/04/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 08/04/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Amended | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Motion to table fails | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 08/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 07/26/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 07/26/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 07/20/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 07/20/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 07/20/2017 | Filed |