Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB26 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 07/19/2017

                            85S10531 AAF-F
 By: Larson H.B. No. 26


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of groundwater.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 36, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 36.1147 to read as follows:
 Sec. 36.1147.  LIMITATION ON APPLICABILITY OF RULES. The
 rules of a district in effect on the date an application for a
 permit or permit amendment is submitted to the district are the only
 district rules that may govern the district's decision to grant or
 deny the application.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 36.122, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 36.122.  EXPORT [TRANSFER] OF GROUNDWATER OUT OF
 DISTRICT.
 SECTION 3.  Section 36.122, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), (c), and (d) and adding Subsections
 (f-1) and (f-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies to [If] an application for a permit
 or an amendment to a permit under Section 36.113 that proposes the
 export [transfer] of groundwater for use outside of a district's
 boundaries[, the district may also consider the provisions of this
 section in determining whether to grant or deny the permit or permit
 amendment].
 (b)  A district may promulgate rules requiring a person to
 obtain an operating [a] permit or an amendment to an operating [a]
 permit under Section 36.113 from the district to produce and export
 [for the transfer of] groundwater.  A district may not require a
 separate permit for the export of groundwater for use outside [out]
 of the district [to:
 [(1)     increase, on or after March 2, 1997, the amount of
 groundwater to be transferred under a continuing arrangement in
 effect before that date; or
 [(2)     transfer groundwater out of the district on or
 after March 2, 1997, under a new arrangement].
 (c)  Except as provided in Subsection (e) [Section
 36.113(e)], the district may not impose more restrictive
 requirements or permit conditions on exporters [transporters] than
 the district imposes on [existing] in-district users. A district
 may not deny a permit because the applicant intends to export
 groundwater for use outside of the district.
 (d)  The district may impose a reasonable fee for processing
 an application under this section. The fee may not exceed fees that
 the district imposes for processing other applications under
 Section 36.113. An application filed under [to comply with] this
 section shall be considered and processed under the same procedures
 as other applications for permits under Section 36.113 [and shall
 be combined with applications filed to obtain a permit for
 in-district water use under Section 36.113 from the same
 applicant].
 (f-1)  A term for a permit issued under this section that
 existed on August 17, 2017, shall automatically be extended on or
 before its expiration:
 (1)  to a term that is not shorter than the term of an
 operating permit for the production of water to be exported that is
 in effect at the time of the extension; and
 (2)  for each additional term for which that operating
 permit for production is renewed under Section 36.1145 or remains
 in effect under Section 36.1146.
 (f-2)  A term automatically extended under Subsection (f-1)
 continues to be subject to conditions contained in the permit as
 issued before the automatic extension.
 SECTION 4.  Chapter 36, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter M-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER M-1. MORATORIUM ON ISSUING PERMIT
 Sec. 36.426.  PROCEDURE FOR ADOPTING MORATORIUM. A district
 may not adopt a moratorium on the issuance of a permit or permit
 amendment unless the district:
 (1)  complies with the notice and hearing procedures
 prescribed by Section 36.427; and
 (2)  makes written findings supporting the district's
 determination regarding the issuance, including the district's
 justification for imposing the moratorium, if applicable.
 Sec. 36.427.  NOTICE AND PUBLIC HEARING REQUIREMENTS. (a) A
 district may impose a moratorium on the issuance of a permit or
 permit amendment only after the district conducts a public hearing
 as provided by this section. The public hearing must provide
 residents of the district and other affected parties an opportunity
 to be heard.
 (b)  The district shall publish notice of the date, time, and
 place of the hearing in a newspaper of general circulation in the
 district on or before the fourth day before the date of the hearing.
 (c)  During the period beginning on the fifth business day
 after the date a notice is published under Subsection (b) and ending
 on the date the district makes its determination under Subsection
 (d), a temporary moratorium is imposed. During that period, a
 district may stop issuing permits or permit amendments.
 (d)  Not later than the 12th day after the date of the public
 hearing, the district shall make a final determination on whether
 to impose the moratorium and shall issue written findings
 supporting the district's determination, including the district's
 justification for imposing the moratorium, if applicable.
 Sec. 36.428.  EXPIRATION OF MORATORIUM; EXTENSION
 PROHIBITED. A moratorium imposed under this subchapter expires on
 the 90th day after the date the district makes its determination
 under Section 36.427(d) to impose the moratorium. The district may
 not extend a moratorium imposed under this subchapter.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 36.122(f), (g), (h), (i), (j), (k),
 (l), (m), (n), (o), (p), and (q), Water Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 6.  A moratorium on the issuance of a permit or
 permit amendment that is adopted by a groundwater conservation
 district before December 1, 2017, may not continue in effect after
 February 28, 2018.
 SECTION 7.  (a)  A permit to export groundwater approved by a
 groundwater conservation district before the effective date of this
 Act is validated and confirmed in all respects.  This subsection
 does not apply to a permit to export groundwater that is subject to
 litigation:
 (1)  that is pending on the effective date of this Act;
 or
 (2)  that results in final judgment that may not be
 appealed that the permit is invalid.
 (b)  An administratively complete permit application to
 export groundwater received by a groundwater conservation district
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect when the application became administratively complete.  The
 former law is continued for the purpose of processing an
 application received before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect December 1, 2017.