Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB30 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 30
1+By: Zerwas, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 30
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House August 8, 2017;
3+ August 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Finance; August 13, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 15, Nays 0;
6+ August 13, 2017, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 30 By: Nelson
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the transfer of certain appropriations to the Texas
6- Education Agency and the Teacher Retirement System of Texas and the
7- adjustment of appropriations for public school finance.
14+ Education Agency and the adjustment of appropriations for public
15+ school finance.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
9- SECTION 1. (a) The amount of $351,000,000 of the
17+ SECTION 1. (a) The amount of $311,000,000 of the
1018 unencumbered appropriations from the general revenue fund for the
1119 state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2019, made by S.B. 1, Acts
1220 of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017 (the General
1321 Appropriations Act), to the Health and Human Services Commission is
1422 transferred to the Texas Education Agency to be used by the agency
1523 during that state fiscal biennium as follows:
1624 (1) $150,000,000 is allocated to fund financial
1725 hardship grants under Subchapter H, Chapter 42, Education Code, as
1826 added by H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called Session,
1927 2017, or similar legislation that enacts a new hardship grant
2028 program for the benefit of school districts that would otherwise
2129 experience a significant loss of revenue during the 2017-2018 or
2230 2018-2019 school year;
2331 (2) $60,000,000 is allocated to fund payments to
2432 open-enrollment charter schools under Section 12.106(d), Education
2533 Code, as added by H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called
2634 Session, 2017, or similar legislation that provides for funding to
2735 open-enrollment charter schools for instructional facilities;
2836 (3) $60,000,000 is allocated for the existing debt
2937 allotment under Section 46.032, Education Code, as amended by H.B.
3038 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2017, or
3139 similar legislation that increases the level of funding under that
32- allotment;
40+ allotment; and
3341 (4) $41,000,000 is allocated for the small-sized
3442 district adjustment under Section 42.103, Education Code, as
3543 amended by H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called
3644 Session, 2017, or similar legislation that addresses the
3745 entitlement under that adjustment for certain school districts that
38- contain less than 300 square miles;
39- (5) $20,000,000 is allocated to be used to award
40- grants authorized under Section 29.026, Education Code, as added by
41- H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2017, or
42- similar legislation that enacts a program to award grants to school
43- districts and open-enrollment charter schools that provide
44- innovative services to students with autism; and
45- (6) $20,000,000 is allocated to be used to award
46- grants authorized under Section 29.027, Education Code, as added by
47- H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2017, or
48- similar legislation that enacts a program to award grants to school
49- districts and open-enrollment charter schools that provide
50- innovative services to students with dyslexia.
46+ contain less than 300 square miles.
5147 (b) The Health and Human Services Commission shall identify
5248 the strategies and objectives out of which the transfer under
53- Subsection (a) of this section is to be made. If the commission
54- makes the amount of appropriations transferred under Subsection (a)
55- of this section available by delaying until the state fiscal
56- biennium beginning September 1, 2019, the monthly capitation
57- payments otherwise due in August 2019 to managed care organizations
58- that contract with the commission to provide health care services
59- to Medicaid recipients, the commission shall make the delayed
60- payments as soon as possible out of available money appropriated to
61- the commission for that state fiscal biennium.
49+ Subsection (a) of this section is to be made.
6250 (c) Notwithstanding the sum-certain appropriations
6351 specified in Rider 3, Chapter 605 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 85th
6452 Legislature, Regular Session, 2017 (the General Appropriations
6553 Act), to the bill pattern of the appropriations to the Texas
6654 Education Agency, the Legislative Budget Board shall determine the
6755 sum-certain appropriation to the Foundation School Program for each
6856 year of the state fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2017,
6957 based on the amount specified in that rider, the other provisions of
7058 the General Appropriations Act, and other law, including the
7159 provisions of this Act.
7260 (d) If H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called
7361 Session, 2017, or another similar Act that addresses additional
7462 funding under the public school finance system for the components
7563 described in Subsection (a) of this section also transfers and
7664 allocates to those components the amount of unencumbered
7765 appropriations in the manner provided by that subsection, the
7866 transfer and allocation under Subsection (a) of this section does
7967 not occur.
80- SECTION 2. (a) The amount of $212,000,000 of the
81- unencumbered appropriations from the general revenue fund for the
82- state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2019, made by S.B. 1, Acts
83- of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017 (the General
84- Appropriations Act), to the Health and Human Services Commission is
85- transferred to the Teacher Retirement System of Texas and may be
86- used by the retirement system during that state fiscal biennium to
87- increase school districts' recruitment and retention of school
88- teachers and provide support to participants in the Texas Public
89- School Employees Group Insurance Program authorized by Chapter
90- 1575, Insurance Code. The Health and Human Services Commission
91- shall identify the strategies and objectives out of which the
92- transfer is to be made.
93- (b) The Teacher Retirement System of Texas may use the money
94- transferred under Subsection (a) of this section to:
95- (1) decrease the premiums and deductibles that would
96- otherwise be paid during the 2018 and 2019 plan years by
97- participants in the Texas Public School Employees Group Insurance
98- Program authorized by Chapter 1575, Insurance Code; and
99- (2) reduce costs for an enrolled adult child with a
100- mental disability or a physical incapacity during the 2018 and 2019
101- plan years.
102- (c) The Teacher Retirement System of Texas shall determine
103- the most efficient allocation of the money transferred under
104- Subsection (a) of this section to achieve the maximum benefit for
105- participants in the program.
106- SECTION 3. This Act takes effect only if the 85th
68+ SECTION 2. This Act takes effect only if the 85th
10769 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2017, enacts H.B. 21 or another
10870 similar Act that addresses additional funding under the public
10971 school finance system for the components described in Section 1 of
11072 this Act and H.B. 21 or that similar Act becomes law. If H.B. 21 or
11173 another similar Act described by this section does not become law,
11274 this Act has no effect.
113- SECTION 4. Except as otherwise provided by this Act:
75+ SECTION 3. Except as otherwise provided by this Act:
11476 (1) this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a
11577 vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
11678 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution; and
11779 (2) if this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
11880 immediate effect, this Act takes effect on the 91st day after the
11981 last day of the legislative session.
120- ______________________________ ______________________________
121- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
122- I certify that H.B. No. 30 was passed by the House on August
123- 7, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 13, 1 present, not
124- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
125- No. 30 on August 15, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 118, Nays
126- 24, 1 present, not voting.
127- ______________________________
128- Chief Clerk of the House
129- I certify that H.B. No. 30 was passed by the Senate, with
130- amendments, on August 15, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 26,
131- Nays 5.
132- ______________________________
133- Secretary of the Senate
134- APPROVED: __________________
135- Date
136- __________________
137- Governor
82+ * * * * *