Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB30 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/15/2017

                            H.B. No. 30


 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of certain appropriations to the Texas
 Education Agency and the Teacher Retirement System of Texas and the
 adjustment of appropriations for public school finance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) The amount of $351,000,000 of the
 unencumbered appropriations from the general revenue fund for the
 state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2019, made by S.B. 1, Acts
 of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017 (the General
 Appropriations Act), to the Health and Human Services Commission is
 transferred to the Texas Education Agency to be used by the agency
 during that state fiscal biennium as follows:
 (1)  $150,000,000 is allocated to fund financial
 hardship grants under Subchapter H, Chapter 42, Education Code, as
 added by H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called Session,
 2017, or similar legislation that enacts a new hardship grant
 program for the benefit of school districts that would otherwise
 experience a significant loss of revenue during the 2017-2018 or
 2018-2019 school year;
 (2)  $60,000,000 is allocated to fund payments to
 open-enrollment charter schools under Section 12.106(d), Education
 Code, as added by H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2017, or similar legislation that provides for funding to
 open-enrollment charter schools for instructional facilities;
 (3)  $60,000,000 is allocated for the existing debt
 allotment under Section 46.032, Education Code, as amended by H.B.
 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2017, or
 similar legislation that increases the level of funding under that
 allotment;
 (4)  $41,000,000 is allocated for the small-sized
 district adjustment under Section 42.103, Education Code, as
 amended by H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2017, or similar legislation that addresses the
 entitlement under that adjustment for certain school districts that
 contain less than 300 square miles;
 (5)  $20,000,000 is allocated to be used to award
 grants authorized under Section 29.026, Education Code, as added by
 H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2017, or
 similar legislation that enacts a program to award grants to school
 districts and open-enrollment charter schools that provide
 innovative services to students with autism; and
 (6)  $20,000,000 is allocated to be used to award
 grants authorized under Section 29.027, Education Code, as added by
 H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2017, or
 similar legislation that enacts a program to award grants to school
 districts and open-enrollment charter schools that provide
 innovative services to students with dyslexia.
 (b)  The Health and Human Services Commission shall identify
 the strategies and objectives out of which the transfer under
 Subsection (a) of this section is to be made.  If the commission
 makes the amount of appropriations transferred under Subsection (a)
 of this section available by delaying until the state fiscal
 biennium beginning September 1, 2019, the monthly capitation
 payments otherwise due in August 2019 to managed care organizations
 that contract with the commission to provide health care services
 to Medicaid recipients, the commission shall make the delayed
 payments as soon as possible out of available money appropriated to
 the commission for that state fiscal biennium.
 (c)  Notwithstanding the sum-certain appropriations
 specified in Rider 3, Chapter 605 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 85th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2017 (the General Appropriations
 Act), to the bill pattern of the appropriations to the Texas
 Education Agency, the Legislative Budget Board shall determine the
 sum-certain appropriation to the Foundation School Program for each
 year of the state fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2017,
 based on the amount specified in that rider, the other provisions of
 the General Appropriations Act, and other law, including the
 provisions of this Act.
 (d)  If H.B. 21, Acts of the 85th Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2017, or another similar Act that addresses additional
 funding under the public school finance system for the components
 described in Subsection (a) of this section also transfers and
 allocates to those components the amount of unencumbered
 appropriations in the manner provided by that subsection, the
 transfer and allocation under Subsection (a) of this section does
 not occur.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The amount of $212,000,000 of the
 unencumbered appropriations from the general revenue fund for the
 state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2019, made by S.B. 1, Acts
 of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017 (the General
 Appropriations Act), to the Health and Human Services Commission is
 transferred to the Teacher Retirement System of Texas and may be
 used by the retirement system during that state fiscal biennium to
 increase school districts' recruitment and retention of school
 teachers and provide support to participants in the Texas Public
 School Employees Group Insurance Program authorized by Chapter
 1575, Insurance Code. The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall identify the strategies and objectives out of which the
 transfer is to be made.
 (b)  The Teacher Retirement System of Texas may use the money
 transferred under Subsection (a) of this section to:
 (1)  decrease the premiums and deductibles that would
 otherwise be paid during the 2018 and 2019 plan years by
 participants in the Texas Public School Employees Group Insurance
 Program authorized by Chapter 1575, Insurance Code; and
 (2)  reduce costs for an enrolled adult child with a
 mental disability or a physical incapacity during the 2018 and 2019
 plan years.
 (c)  The Teacher Retirement System of Texas shall determine
 the most efficient allocation of the money transferred under
 Subsection (a) of this section to achieve the maximum benefit for
 participants in the program.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect only if the 85th
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2017, enacts H.B. 21 or another
 similar Act that addresses additional funding under the public
 school finance system for the components described in Section 1 of
 this Act and H.B. 21 or that similar Act becomes law.  If H.B. 21 or
 another similar Act described by this section does not become law,
 this Act has no effect.
 SECTION 4.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act:
 (1)  this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a
 vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution; and
 (2)  if this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect on the 91st day after the
 last day of the legislative session.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 30 was passed by the House on August
 7, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 131, Nays 13, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 30 on August 15, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 118, Nays
 24, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 30 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on August 15, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 26,
 Nays 5.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor