Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB373 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 08/02/2017

                            85S11905 KFF-D
 By: Dukes H.B. No. 373


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an audit of the use of Temporary Assistance for Needy
 Families (TANF) program money.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 31, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 31.046 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.046.  AUDIT OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE PROGRAM MONEY BY
 STATE AUDITOR'S OFFICE.  (a)  The State Auditor's Office shall
 conduct an audit of the use of the money appropriated to the
 commission or another agency of this state to provide cash
 assistance benefits under the financial assistance program
 established under this chapter during the six state fiscal years
 beginning September 1, 2010.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the State Auditor's
 Office shall submit a written report of the audit conducted under
 this section to the legislature.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect December 1, 2017.