1 | 1 | | 85S10678 BPG-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Turner H.C.R. No. 25 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
6 | 6 | | WHEREAS, On June 14, 2016, the Washington Post reported that |
---|
7 | 7 | | the Russian government had penetrated the computer network of the |
---|
8 | 8 | | Democratic National Committee and that Russian government hackers |
---|
9 | 9 | | had targeted the networks of both presidential candidates, as well |
---|
10 | 10 | | as the computers of some Republican political action committees; |
---|
11 | 11 | | and |
---|
12 | 12 | | WHEREAS, Indications of Russian interference in the |
---|
13 | 13 | | electoral process continued to mount in the ensuing months; the |
---|
14 | 14 | | Washington Post reported that the FBI had alerted Arizona election |
---|
15 | 15 | | officials in June that Russians were behind an assault on their |
---|
16 | 16 | | state's voter registration system; as a result, election officials |
---|
17 | 17 | | shut down the system for nearly a week; according to the FBI, a |
---|
18 | 18 | | similar attack on the state voter registration database in Illinois |
---|
19 | 19 | | appeared to offer further evidence of Russian interest in U.S. |
---|
20 | 20 | | elections; on October 7, 2016, the U.S. Department of Homeland |
---|
21 | 21 | | Security and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence |
---|
22 | 22 | | issued a joint statement expressing confidence that "the Russian |
---|
23 | 23 | | Government directed the recent compromises of e-mails from U.S. |
---|
24 | 24 | | persons and institutions, including from U.S. political |
---|
25 | 25 | | organizations"; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | WHEREAS, In response to these incursions, President Barack |
---|
27 | 27 | | Obama released a December 29, 2016, executive order "taking |
---|
28 | 28 | | additional steps to address the national emergency with respect to |
---|
29 | 29 | | significant malicious cyber-enabled activities"; the order blocked |
---|
30 | 30 | | all property and interests in property in the United States |
---|
31 | 31 | | belonging to five entities based in Russia and four individuals of |
---|
32 | 32 | | Russian nationality; in addition, the White House ordered 35 |
---|
33 | 33 | | Russian operatives to leave the United States, and it closed two |
---|
34 | 34 | | Russian-owned facilities believed to have been used for |
---|
35 | 35 | | intelligence purposes; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | WHEREAS, Just eight days later, the Office of the Director of |
---|
37 | 37 | | National Intelligence released an Intelligence Community |
---|
38 | 38 | | Assessment of Russian activities and intentions in recent U.S. |
---|
39 | 39 | | elections, which determined that Russian president Vladimir Putin |
---|
40 | 40 | | ordered his country's campaign to influence the 2016 U.S. |
---|
41 | 41 | | presidential election, that the campaign was multifaceted, that the |
---|
42 | 42 | | influence effort was the boldest yet in the United States, and that |
---|
43 | 43 | | the election operation signaled a "new normal" in Russian influence |
---|
44 | 44 | | endeavors; the U.S. intelligence community also assessed with high |
---|
45 | 45 | | confidence that Russian military intelligence relayed U.S. victim |
---|
46 | 46 | | data to WikiLeaks and that Russian intelligence obtained and |
---|
47 | 47 | | maintained access to elements of multiple U.S. state or local |
---|
48 | 48 | | electoral boards; and |
---|
49 | 49 | | WHEREAS, Then-FBI Director James Comey testified before the |
---|
50 | 50 | | House Intelligence Committee on March 20, 2017, to confirm his |
---|
51 | 51 | | agency's wide-ranging investigation of Russian meddling in the 2016 |
---|
52 | 52 | | presidential election, which was ordered by President Vladimir |
---|
53 | 53 | | Putin to undermine Hillary Clinton's bid for office and improve the |
---|
54 | 54 | | odds for Donald Trump; Mr. Comey noted that the Russians were |
---|
55 | 55 | | successful in injecting "chaos and discord" into the electoral |
---|
56 | 56 | | process and consequently could be expected to resume such |
---|
57 | 57 | | activities in future elections, and revealed that the FBI is |
---|
58 | 58 | | looking into possible coordination between the Kremlin and the |
---|
59 | 59 | | Trump campaign; subsequently, Mr. Comey was fired by President |
---|
60 | 60 | | Trump, and on June 8, 2017, he testified before the Senate |
---|
61 | 61 | | Intelligence Committee that the president had pressured him to |
---|
62 | 62 | | redirect the FBI's Russia probe and that his dismissal stemmed from |
---|
63 | 63 | | his resistance to that pressure; and |
---|
64 | 64 | | WHEREAS, Special counsel Robert S. Mueller III is now leading |
---|
65 | 65 | | a rapidly expanding investigation into Russian interference in our |
---|
66 | 66 | | electoral process, and the Justice Department and congressional |
---|
67 | 67 | | intelligence committees are also examining whether the Trump |
---|
68 | 68 | | campaign assisted Russian operatives in a cyberattack of |
---|
69 | 69 | | unprecedented scale, which encompassed hacking of e-mail accounts |
---|
70 | 70 | | and voting registration systems, the sophisticated targeting of |
---|
71 | 71 | | voters, and the wide dissemination of fake news and stolen e-mails; |
---|
72 | 72 | | the gravity of the situation became even more clear in July when the |
---|
73 | 73 | | president's son, Donald Trump Jr., released a series of e-mails |
---|
74 | 74 | | that had arranged a meeting regarding information described as |
---|
75 | 75 | | "part of Russia and its government's support for Mr. Trump"; over |
---|
76 | 76 | | the course of several days, it emerged that participants in the |
---|
77 | 77 | | meeting included the president's son, his son-in-law and advisor, |
---|
78 | 78 | | Jared Kushner, and his former campaign manager, Paul Manafort, |
---|
79 | 79 | | along with a highly placed Russian lawyer, a former Soviet |
---|
80 | 80 | | counterintelligence officer who now works as a lobbyist, and the |
---|
81 | 81 | | representative of the president's Russian business associate; the |
---|
82 | 82 | | Russian financial connections of Mr. Kushner and Mr. Manafort are |
---|
83 | 83 | | under investigation, according to the Washington Post, as are those |
---|
84 | 84 | | of former national security adviser Michael Flynn and former |
---|
85 | 85 | | campaign adviser Carter Page; and |
---|
86 | 86 | | WHEREAS, In light of continually unfolding evidence of |
---|
87 | 87 | | Russian interference in U.S. elections, it is the fundamental |
---|
88 | 88 | | responsibility of Congress to decide where, how, and by whom |
---|
89 | 89 | | financial resources in its control should be invested with regard |
---|
90 | 90 | | to Russia; our government should not provide funds that can be used |
---|
91 | 91 | | to facilitate the Russian government's campaign to influence our |
---|
92 | 92 | | election processes; now, therefore, be it |
---|
93 | 93 | | RESOLVED, That the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas, |
---|
94 | 94 | | 1st Called Session, hereby respectfully urge the United States |
---|
95 | 95 | | Congress to bar investments in Russia until investigations into |
---|
96 | 96 | | Russian interference with U.S. elections have been completed; and, |
---|
97 | 97 | | be it further |
---|
98 | 98 | | RESOLVED, That the Texas secretary of state forward official |
---|
99 | 99 | | copies of this resolution to the president of the United States, to |
---|
100 | 100 | | the president of the Senate and the speaker of the House of |
---|
101 | 101 | | Representatives of the United States Congress, and to all the |
---|
102 | 102 | | members of the Texas delegation to Congress with the request that |
---|
103 | 103 | | this resolution be entered in the Congressional Record as a |
---|
104 | 104 | | memorial to the Congress of the United States of America. |
---|