Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HCR25 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 07/27/2017

                            85S10678 BPG-D
 By: Turner H.C.R. No. 25


 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, On June 14, 2016, the Washington Post reported that
 the Russian government had penetrated the computer network of the
 Democratic National Committee and that Russian government hackers
 had targeted the networks of both presidential candidates, as well
 as the computers of some Republican political action committees;
 and
 WHEREAS, Indications of Russian interference in the
 electoral process continued to mount in the ensuing months; the
 Washington Post reported that the FBI had alerted Arizona election
 officials in June that Russians were behind an assault on their
 state's voter registration system; as a result, election officials
 shut down the system for nearly a week; according to the FBI, a
 similar attack on the state voter registration database in Illinois
 appeared to offer further evidence of Russian interest in U.S.
 elections; on October 7, 2016, the U.S. Department of Homeland
 Security and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence
 issued a joint statement expressing confidence that "the Russian
 Government directed the recent compromises of e-mails from U.S.
 persons and institutions, including from U.S. political
 organizations"; and
 WHEREAS, In response to these incursions, President Barack
 Obama released a December 29, 2016, executive order "taking
 additional steps to address the national emergency with respect to
 significant malicious cyber-enabled activities"; the order blocked
 all property and interests in property in the United States
 belonging to five entities based in Russia and four individuals of
 Russian nationality; in addition, the White House ordered 35
 Russian operatives to leave the United States, and it closed two
 Russian-owned facilities believed to have been used for
 intelligence purposes; and
 WHEREAS, Just eight days later, the Office of the Director of
 National Intelligence released an Intelligence Community
 Assessment of Russian activities and intentions in recent U.S.
 elections, which determined that Russian president Vladimir Putin
 ordered his country's campaign to influence the 2016 U.S.
 presidential election, that the campaign was multifaceted, that the
 influence effort was the boldest yet in the United States, and that
 the election operation signaled a "new normal" in Russian influence
 endeavors; the U.S. intelligence community also assessed with high
 confidence that Russian military intelligence relayed U.S. victim
 data to WikiLeaks and that Russian intelligence obtained and
 maintained access to elements of multiple U.S. state or local
 electoral boards; and
 WHEREAS, Then-FBI Director James Comey testified before the
 House Intelligence Committee on March 20, 2017, to confirm his
 agency's wide-ranging investigation of Russian meddling in the 2016
 presidential election, which was ordered by President Vladimir
 Putin to undermine Hillary Clinton's bid for office and improve the
 odds for Donald Trump; Mr. Comey noted that the Russians were
 successful in injecting "chaos and discord" into the electoral
 process and consequently could be expected to resume such
 activities in future elections, and revealed that the FBI is
 looking into possible coordination between the Kremlin and the
 Trump campaign; subsequently, Mr. Comey was fired by President
 Trump, and on June 8, 2017, he testified before the Senate
 Intelligence Committee that the president had pressured him to
 redirect the FBI's Russia probe and that his dismissal stemmed from
 his resistance to that pressure; and
 WHEREAS, Special counsel Robert S. Mueller III is now leading
 a rapidly expanding investigation into Russian interference in our
 electoral process, and the Justice Department and congressional
 intelligence committees are also examining whether the Trump
 campaign assisted Russian operatives in a cyberattack of
 unprecedented scale, which encompassed hacking of e-mail accounts
 and voting registration systems, the sophisticated targeting of
 voters, and the wide dissemination of fake news and stolen e-mails;
 the gravity of the situation became even more clear in July when the
 president's son, Donald Trump Jr., released a series of e-mails
 that had arranged a meeting regarding information described as
 "part of Russia and its government's support for Mr. Trump"; over
 the course of several days, it emerged that participants in the
 meeting included the president's son, his son-in-law and advisor,
 Jared Kushner, and his former campaign manager, Paul Manafort,
 along with a highly placed Russian lawyer, a former Soviet
 counterintelligence officer who now works as a lobbyist, and the
 representative of the president's Russian business associate; the
 Russian financial connections of Mr. Kushner and Mr. Manafort are
 under investigation, according to the Washington Post, as are those
 of former national security adviser Michael Flynn and former
 campaign adviser Carter Page; and
 WHEREAS, In light of continually unfolding evidence of
 Russian interference in U.S. elections, it is the fundamental
 responsibility of Congress to decide where, how, and by whom
 financial resources in its control should be invested with regard
 to Russia; our government should not provide funds that can be used
 to facilitate the Russian government's campaign to influence our
 election processes; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas,
 1st Called Session, hereby respectfully urge the United States
 Congress to bar investments in Russia until investigations into
 Russian interference with U.S. elections have been completed; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That the Texas secretary of state forward official
 copies of this resolution to the president of the United States, to
 the president of the Senate and the speaker of the House of
 Representatives of the United States Congress, and to all the
 members of the Texas delegation to Congress with the request that
 this resolution be entered in the Congressional Record as a
 memorial to the Congress of the United States of America.