House | 08/09/2017 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 08/09/2017 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 08/09/2017 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | ||
House | 08/09/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 08/08/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 08/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 07/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 07/24/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 07/24/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 07/17/2017 | Filed |