Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HR126 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/17/2017

                            H.R. No. 126


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Patricia
 Gayle Eversole of Houston, who passed away on July 16, 2017, at the
 age of 73; and
 WHEREAS, Born to Arthur and Mary Morgan on August 5, 1943, in
 Dallas, the former Pat Morgan grew up with the companionship of two
 sisters, JoAnn and Loretta, and a brother, Arthur; she attended Sam
 Houston State University and enjoyed a successful career in
 education, starting out as a teacher in Liberty and going on to
 serve for more than two decades as a school counselor in the Humble
 Independent School District; and
 WHEREAS, On October 1, 1966, she was joined in matrimony to
 her college sweetheart, Jerry Eversole, with whom she shared a
 rewarding marriage that spanned half a century; over the years, the
 couple became the proud parents of two sons, Dayne and Lance, and
 their lives were further enriched by their two grandsons, Hayden
 and Luke; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Eversole gave back to her community by
 volunteering at the Star of Hope Mission, and she pursued a number
 of hobbies, including reading and gardening; she also took great
 pleasure in going to the beach with her family, hosting holiday
 gatherings, and catching up with her Alpha Chi Omega Sorority
 sisters at their annual reunion; and
 WHEREAS, Those fortunate enough to have known Pat Eversole
 will remember the way she touched their lives with her warmth, her
 optimism, and her brilliant smile, and she will forever hold a
 treasured place in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 Patricia Gayle Eversole and extend heartfelt sympathy to her
 relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Pat
 Eversole.
 Huberty
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 126 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on August 15, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House