Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HR471 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/17/2017

                            H.R. No. 471


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A rich and purposeful life drew to a close with the
 passing of George Dawson of Dallas on July 26, 2017, at the age of
 96; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Scottish immigrants, George Dawson was
 born in Brooklyn, New York, on April 29, 1921, to George and Mary
 Dawson; as a young man, he raised homing pigeons on the roof of his
 apartment building and learned to play the violin, the piano, and
 the trumpet, marking the beginning of his lifelong passion for
 music; shortly after graduating from high school, he married the
 former Gertrude Becker, and he became the proud father of a
 daughter, Diane; and
 WHEREAS, During World War II, Mr. Dawson served in the U.S.
 Army as a trumpeter in a USO dance band, and after the war, he
 studied music at North Texas State University; he went on to enjoy a
 rewarding career as a bass player for the Dallas Symphony
 Orchestra, and in the off-season, he performed with several bands
 and taught classes on such varied topics as music appreciation,
 ballroom dancing, and fencing; and
 WHEREAS, On October 31, 1952, Mr. Dawson wed his second wife,
 the former Kim Garrett; they shared 57 years of marriage before her
 passing in 2010, and they became the loving parents of three
 children, Kim, Lisa, and George; while continuing to perform with
 the symphony, Mr. Dawson became interested in photography and
 established himself as a successful commercial and fashion
 photographer, taking part in shoots at locations around the world,
 including Kenya, Thailand, Peru, Greece, and Ireland; after
 retiring from photography in 1982, he went to work managing his
 wife's modeling and talent business, the Kim Dawson Agency; and
 WHEREAS, A man of many interests, Mr. Dawson was an avid
 tennis player and an art collector, and he counted studying French,
 attending the opera, and traveling with Mrs. Dawson among his
 favorite pursuits; he especially delighted in the time he spent
 with his grandchildren, Chris, Dana, Taylor, Lauren, Anna,
 Kimberly, and Aidan, and his great-grandchildren, Guerin and
 Dawson; and
 WHEREAS, Admired for his kindness, his generosity, and his
 devotion to his family, George Dawson lived life to the fullest, and
 the wonderful memories he leaves behind will long inspire all who
 had the good fortune to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 George Dawson and extend heartfelt sympathy to his relatives and
 many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of George
 Dawson.
 Meyer
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 471 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on August 15, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House