House | 08/09/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 08/09/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 08/09/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 08/09/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 08/07/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 08/07/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 07/27/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Passed as amended | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Amended | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Amendment adopted as amended | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Amendment to amendment fails of adoption | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Amendment amended | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Amendment to amendment offered | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 07/24/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 07/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 07/23/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 07/22/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 07/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 07/14/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 07/14/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |