Senate | 05/09/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Record vote RV#604 | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Record vote RV#559 | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | ||
House | 01/23/2019 | Filed |