Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1038 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/09/2019

                            By: Burns, Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1038
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 9, 2019, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a petition by residents of certain counties for an
 election regarding voter approval of municipal annexation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 43.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.004.  PETITION FOR ELECTION ON CONSIDERATION AS TIER
 2 COUNTY. (a) The registered voters of a tier 1 county may file a
 petition with the commissioners court of the county requesting an
 election in the county to determine whether the county should be
 considered a tier 2 county for the purposes of this chapter. The
 petition must contain the signatures of at least 10 percent of the
 registered voters of the county.
 (b)  The commissioners court of a county that receives a
 petition for an election under Subsection (a) shall:
 (1)  verify the signatures on the petition; and
 (2)  if the county verifies that the petition satisfies
 the signature requirement under Subsection (a):
 (A)  order the election; and
 (B)  provide notice of the verified petition as
 soon as practicable to the governing body of each municipality:
 (i)  located wholly or partly in the county;
 or
 (ii)  with extraterritorial jurisdiction in
 the county.
 (c)  On receipt of the notice described by Subsection
 (b)(2)(B), the governing body shall suspend any pending annexation
 that would be affected by the outcome of the election until after
 the election is held.
 (d)  If a majority of the votes cast at an election held under
 Subsection (b) favor the proposition, the county is considered a
 tier 2 county for the purposes of this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 43.001(3), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (3)  "Tier 2 county" means a county that[:
 [(A)]  is not a tier 1 county[; or
 [(B)     is a tier 1 county in which a majority of the
 registered voters of the county have approved being a tier 2 county
 at an election ordered by the commissioners court on the request by
 petition of a number of registered voters of the county equal to or
 greater than 10 percent of the registered voters of the county].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *