1 | | - | H.B. No. 105 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Minjarez (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 105 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Transportation; May 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 1, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the inclusion of information about oversize and |
---|
6 | 12 | | overweight vehicles in the curriculum of driver education and |
---|
7 | 13 | | driving safety courses. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is |
---|
10 | 16 | | amended by adding Section 1001.1092 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 17 | | Sec. 1001.1092. INFORMATION RELATING TO OVERSIZE AND |
---|
12 | 18 | | OVERWEIGHT VEHICLES. The commission by rule shall require that |
---|
13 | 19 | | information relating to methods of safely operating a motor vehicle |
---|
14 | 20 | | near an oversize or overweight vehicle, including safe following |
---|
15 | 21 | | distances and safe passing methods, be included in the curriculum |
---|
16 | 22 | | of each driver education course and driving safety course. |
---|
17 | 23 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than March 1, 2020, the Texas |
---|
18 | 24 | | Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules |
---|
19 | 25 | | required by Section 1001.1092, Education Code, as added by this |
---|
20 | 26 | | Act. |
---|
21 | 27 | | (b) Not later than September 1, 2020, each provider of a |
---|
22 | 28 | | driver education course or driving safety course shall submit the |
---|
23 | 29 | | curriculum adopted pursuant to Section 1001.1092, Education Code, |
---|
24 | 30 | | as added by this Act, to the Texas Commission of Licensing and |
---|
25 | 31 | | Regulation for approval. |
---|
26 | 32 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
27 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
28 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
29 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 105 was passed by the House on April |
---|
30 | | - | 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
31 | | - | voting. |
---|
32 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
33 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
34 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 105 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
35 | | - | 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
38 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Date |
---|
40 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 33 | + | * * * * * |
---|