H.B. No. 105 AN ACT relating to the inclusion of information about oversize and overweight vehicles in the curriculum of driver education and driving safety courses. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 1001.1092 to read as follows: Sec. 1001.1092. INFORMATION RELATING TO OVERSIZE AND OVERWEIGHT VEHICLES. The commission by rule shall require that information relating to methods of safely operating a motor vehicle near an oversize or overweight vehicle, including safe following distances and safe passing methods, be included in the curriculum of each driver education course and driving safety course. SECTION 2. (a) Not later than March 1, 2020, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules required by Section 1001.1092, Education Code, as added by this Act. (b) Not later than September 1, 2020, each provider of a driver education course or driving safety course shall submit the curriculum adopted pursuant to Section 1001.1092, Education Code, as added by this Act, to the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation for approval. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 105 was passed by the House on April 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 105 was passed by the Senate on May 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor