1 | | - | H.B. No. 109 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Martinez (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 109 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House March 21, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | March 27, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | | - | SECTION 1. Section 12A.004(a), Education Code, is amended |
---|
9 | | - | to read as follows: |
---|
10 | | - | (a) A local innovation plan may not provide for the |
---|
11 | | - | exemption of a district designated as a district of innovation from |
---|
12 | | - | the following provisions of this title: |
---|
13 | | - | (1) a state or federal requirement applicable to an |
---|
14 | | - | open-enrollment charter school operating under Subchapter D, |
---|
15 | | - | Chapter 12, except that a district may be exempt from Section |
---|
16 | | - | 25.081(f), as added by Chapter 1144 (H.B. 441), Acts of the 85th |
---|
17 | | - | Legislature, Regular Session, 2017; |
---|
18 | | - | (2) Subchapters A, C, D, and E, Chapter 11, except that |
---|
19 | | - | a district may be exempt from Sections 11.1511(b)(5) and (14) and |
---|
20 | | - | Section 11.162; |
---|
21 | | - | (3) state curriculum and graduation requirements |
---|
22 | | - | adopted under Chapter 28; and |
---|
23 | | - | (4) academic and financial accountability and |
---|
24 | | - | sanctions under Chapters 39 and 39A. |
---|
25 | | - | SECTION 2. Section 25.081(f), Education Code, as added by |
---|
| 14 | + | SECTION 1. Section 25.081(f), Education Code, as added by |
---|
26 | 15 | | Chapter 1144 (H.B. 441), Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular |
---|
27 | 16 | | Session, 2017, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
28 | 17 | | (f) A school district or open-enrollment charter school may |
---|
29 | 18 | | not provide student instruction on Memorial Day. If a school |
---|
30 | 19 | | district or open-enrollment charter school would be required to |
---|
31 | 20 | | provide student instruction on Memorial Day to compensate for |
---|
32 | 21 | | minutes of instruction lost because of school closures caused by |
---|
33 | 22 | | disaster, flood, extreme weather conditions, fuel curtailment, or |
---|
34 | 23 | | another calamity, the commissioner shall approve the instruction of |
---|
35 | 24 | | students for fewer than the number of minutes required under |
---|
36 | 25 | | Subsection (a). |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 109 was passed by the House on March |
---|
47 | | - | 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
48 | | - | voting; |
---|
49 | | - | that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. |
---|
50 | | - | 109 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 6, 2 |
---|
51 | | - | present, not voting; and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 185 |
---|
52 | | - | authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 109 on May 24, 2019, by |
---|
53 | | - | the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
54 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
56 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 109 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
57 | | - | amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
58 | | - | 0; and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 185 authorizing certain |
---|
59 | | - | corrections in H.B. No. 109 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: |
---|
60 | | - | Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
61 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
63 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Date |
---|
65 | | - | __________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 33 | + | * * * * * |
---|