Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB109 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            H.B. No. 109


 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of open-enrollment charter schools on
 Memorial Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12A.004(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A local innovation plan may not provide for the
 exemption of a district designated as a district of innovation from
 the following provisions of this title:
 (1)  a state or federal requirement applicable to an
 open-enrollment charter school operating under Subchapter D,
 Chapter 12, except that a district may be exempt from Section
 25.081(f), as added by Chapter 1144 (H.B. 441), Acts of the 85th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2017;
 (2)  Subchapters A, C, D, and E, Chapter 11, except that
 a district may be exempt from Sections 11.1511(b)(5) and (14) and
 Section 11.162;
 (3)  state curriculum and graduation requirements
 adopted under Chapter 28; and
 (4)  academic and financial accountability and
 sanctions under Chapters 39 and 39A.
 SECTION 2.  Section 25.081(f), Education Code, as added by
 Chapter 1144 (H.B. 441), Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2017, is amended to read as follows:
 (f)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
 not provide student instruction on Memorial Day. If a school
 district or open-enrollment charter school would be required to
 provide student instruction on Memorial Day to compensate for
 minutes of instruction lost because of school closures caused by
 disaster, flood, extreme weather conditions, fuel curtailment, or
 another calamity, the commissioner shall approve the instruction of
 students for fewer than the number of minutes required under
 Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 109 was passed by the House on March
 20, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting;
 that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No.
 109 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 135, Nays 6, 2
 present, not voting; and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 185
 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 109 on May 24, 2019, by
 the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 109 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 185 authorizing certain
 corrections in H.B. No. 109 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:
 Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor