Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019