1 | | - | H.B. No. 1140 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1140 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the |
---|
| 5 | + | following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to fees for vehicles stored at vehicle storage facilities; |
---|
6 | 12 | | authorizing fee increases and decreases; eliminating a fee; |
---|
7 | 13 | | eliminating a minimum fee. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Sections 2303.155(a) and (b), Occupations Code, |
---|
10 | 16 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 17 | | (a) For the purposes of this section, "governmental vehicle |
---|
12 | 18 | | storage facility" means a garage, parking lot, or other facility |
---|
13 | 19 | | that is: |
---|
14 | 20 | | (1) [(A)] owned by a governmental entity; and |
---|
15 | 21 | | (2) [(B)] used to store or park at least 10 vehicles |
---|
16 | 22 | | each year. |
---|
17 | 23 | | (b) The operator of a vehicle storage facility or |
---|
18 | 24 | | governmental vehicle storage facility may charge the owner of a |
---|
19 | 25 | | vehicle stored or parked at the facility: |
---|
20 | 26 | | (1) a notification fee set in a reasonable amount for |
---|
21 | 27 | | providing notice under this subchapter, including notice under |
---|
22 | 28 | | Section 2303.154(c); |
---|
23 | 29 | | (2) an impoundment fee of $20, subject to Section |
---|
24 | 30 | | 2303.1552, for any action that: |
---|
25 | 31 | | (A) is taken by or at the direction of the owner |
---|
26 | 32 | | or operator of the facility; and |
---|
27 | 33 | | (B) is necessary to preserve, protect, or service |
---|
28 | 34 | | a vehicle stored or parked at the facility; |
---|
29 | 35 | | (3) a daily storage fee, subject to Section 2303.1552, |
---|
30 | 36 | | of: |
---|
31 | 37 | | (A) [not less than $5 and not more than] $20 for |
---|
32 | 38 | | each day or part of a day the vehicle is stored at the facility if |
---|
33 | 39 | | the vehicle is not longer than 25 feet; or |
---|
34 | 40 | | (B) $35 for each day or part of a day the vehicle |
---|
35 | 41 | | is stored at the facility if the vehicle is longer than 25 feet; and |
---|
36 | 42 | | (4) any fee that is required to be submitted to a law |
---|
37 | 43 | | enforcement agency, the agency's authorized agent, or a |
---|
38 | 44 | | governmental entity [; and |
---|
39 | 45 | | [(5) a fee in an amount set by the commission for the |
---|
40 | 46 | | remediation, recovery, or capture of an environmental or biological |
---|
41 | 47 | | hazard]. |
---|
42 | 48 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 2303, Occupations Code, is |
---|
43 | 49 | | amended by adding Section 2303.1552 to read as follows: |
---|
44 | 50 | | Sec. 2303.1552. BIENNIAL ADJUSTMENT OF CERTAIN FEES. (a) |
---|
45 | 51 | | In this section, "consumer price index" means the Consumer Price |
---|
46 | 52 | | Index for All Urban Consumers (CPI-U) published by the Bureau of |
---|
47 | 53 | | Labor Statistics of the United States Department of Labor. |
---|
48 | | - | (b) Each odd-numbered year, the commission, not later than |
---|
49 | | - | November 1: |
---|
50 | | - | (1) by rule may adjust the impoundment fee under |
---|
51 | | - | Section 2303.155(b)(2) and the storage fees under Section |
---|
52 | | - | 2303.155(b)(3) by an amount equal to the amount of the applicable |
---|
53 | | - | fee in effect on December 31 of the preceding year multiplied by the |
---|
54 | | - | percentage increase or decrease in the consumer price index during |
---|
55 | | - | the preceding state fiscal biennium; and |
---|
56 | | - | (2) if the fees are adjusted under Subdivision (1), |
---|
57 | | - | shall publish the adjusted fees on the department's Internet |
---|
58 | | - | website. |
---|
59 | | - | (c) A fee adjusted under Subsection (b) is effective |
---|
60 | | - | beginning the January 1 following the adoption of a rule under that |
---|
61 | | - | subsection. |
---|
| 54 | + | (b) On January 1 of each even-numbered year, the impoundment |
---|
| 55 | + | fee under Section 2303.155(b)(2) and the storage fees under Section |
---|
| 56 | + | 2303.155(b)(3) are increased or decreased by an amount equal to the |
---|
| 57 | + | amount of the applicable fee in effect on December 31 of the |
---|
| 58 | + | preceding year multiplied by the percentage increase or decrease in |
---|
| 59 | + | the consumer price index during the preceding state fiscal |
---|
| 60 | + | biennium. |
---|
| 61 | + | (c) Not later than November 1 of each odd-numbered year, the |
---|
| 62 | + | commission shall: |
---|
| 63 | + | (1) adjust the fees in accordance with Subsection (b); |
---|
| 64 | + | and |
---|
| 65 | + | (2) publish the adjusted fees on the department's |
---|
| 66 | + | Internet website. |
---|
62 | 67 | | (d) If a fee is decreased under this section, the operator |
---|
63 | 68 | | of a vehicle storage facility or governmental vehicle storage |
---|
64 | 69 | | facility, as defined by Section 2303.155, shall begin charging the |
---|
65 | 70 | | adjusted fee on the effective date of the decrease. If a fee is |
---|
66 | 71 | | increased under this section, the operator may begin charging the |
---|
67 | 72 | | adjusted fee at any time on or after the effective date of the |
---|
68 | 73 | | increase. |
---|
69 | 74 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
70 | 75 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
71 | 76 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
72 | 77 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
73 | 78 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
74 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
75 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
76 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1140 was passed by the House on April |
---|
77 | | - | 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 118, Nays 13, 1 present, not |
---|
78 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
79 | | - | No. 1140 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 125, Nays 17, |
---|
80 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
81 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
82 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
83 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1140 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
84 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
85 | | - | 1. |
---|
86 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
87 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
88 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
89 | | - | Date |
---|
90 | | - | __________________ |
---|
91 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 79 | + | * * * * * |
---|