House | 04/26/2019 | Postponed 7/1/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Postponed 4/26/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Postponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Postponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Referred to Business & Industry | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 01/30/2019 | Filed |