Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1241 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019