1 | | - | H.B. No. 1262 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Bell of Kaufman, et al. H.B. No. 1262 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 5 | + | Transportation; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 9, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1262 By: Nichols |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the extended registration of certain vehicles not |
---|
6 | 15 | | subject to inspection. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code, |
---|
9 | 18 | | is amended by adding Section 502.0024 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 19 | | Sec. 502.0024. EXTENDED REGISTRATION OF CERTAIN VEHICLES |
---|
11 | 20 | | NOT SUBJECT TO INSPECTION. (a) Notwithstanding Section |
---|
12 | 21 | | 502.044(c), the department shall develop and implement a system of |
---|
13 | 22 | | registration to allow an owner of a vehicle described by Section |
---|
14 | 23 | | 548.052(3) other than a mobile home to register the vehicle for an |
---|
15 | 24 | | extended registration period of not more than five years. The owner |
---|
16 | 25 | | may select the number of years for registration under this section |
---|
17 | 26 | | within that range and register the vehicle for that period. Payment |
---|
18 | 27 | | for all applicable fees, including any optional fee imposed under |
---|
19 | 28 | | Subchapter H and other registration fees and the fee required by |
---|
20 | 29 | | Section 548.510, for the entire registration period selected is due |
---|
21 | 30 | | at the time of registration. |
---|
22 | 31 | | (b) The fee required by Section 548.510 shall be remitted to |
---|
23 | 32 | | the comptroller for deposit in the Texas mobility fund, the general |
---|
24 | 33 | | revenue fund, and the clean air account in amounts proportionate to |
---|
25 | 34 | | the allocation prescribed by Subsection (b) of that section. |
---|
26 | 35 | | (c) The fees imposed under Subchapter H shall be collected |
---|
27 | 36 | | and remitted as prescribed by that subchapter. |
---|
28 | 37 | | SECTION 2. Not later than February 1, 2020, the Texas |
---|
29 | 38 | | Department of Motor Vehicles shall adopt the system required by |
---|
30 | 39 | | Section 502.0024, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, and |
---|
31 | 40 | | any rules necessary to implement that section. |
---|
32 | 41 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
33 | 42 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
34 | 43 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
35 | 44 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
36 | 45 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
39 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1262 was passed by the House on April |
---|
40 | | - | 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 1, 1 present, not |
---|
41 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
42 | | - | No. 1262 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, |
---|
43 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1262 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
47 | | - | amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
48 | | - | 0. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
51 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Date |
---|
53 | | - | __________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 46 | + | * * * * * |
---|