Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1262 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/22/2019

                            H.B. No. 1262


 AN ACT
 relating to the extended registration of certain vehicles not
 subject to inspection.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.0024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.0024.  EXTENDED REGISTRATION OF CERTAIN VEHICLES
 NOT SUBJECT TO INSPECTION. (a) Notwithstanding Section
 502.044(c), the department shall develop and implement a system of
 registration to allow an owner of a vehicle described by Section
 548.052(3) other than a mobile home to register the vehicle for an
 extended registration period of not more than five years. The owner
 may select the number of years for registration under this section
 within that range and register the vehicle for that period. Payment
 for all applicable fees, including any optional fee imposed under
 Subchapter H and other registration fees and the fee required by
 Section 548.510, for the entire registration period selected is due
 at the time of registration.
 (b)  The fee required by Section 548.510 shall be remitted to
 the comptroller for deposit in the Texas mobility fund, the general
 revenue fund, and the clean air account in amounts proportionate to
 the allocation prescribed by Subsection (b) of that section.
 (c)  The fees imposed under Subchapter H shall be collected
 and remitted as prescribed by that subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than February 1, 2020, the Texas
 Department of Motor Vehicles shall adopt the system required by
 Section 502.0024, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, and
 any rules necessary to implement that section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1262 was passed by the House on April
 25, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 1, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1262 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1262 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor