1 | | - | H.B. No. 1313 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: King of Parker (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1313 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Property |
---|
| 4 | + | Tax; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas |
---|
| 5 | + | 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | | - | SECTION 1. Section 11.26, Tax Code, is amended by amending |
---|
8 | | - | Subsection (i) and adding Subsection (i-1) to read as follows: |
---|
9 | | - | (i) If an individual who qualifies for the exemption |
---|
10 | | - | provided by Section 11.13(c) [for an individual 65 years of age or |
---|
11 | | - | older] dies, the surviving spouse of the individual is entitled to |
---|
12 | | - | the limitation applicable to the residence homestead of the |
---|
13 | | - | individual if: |
---|
14 | | - | (1) the surviving spouse is 55 years of age or older |
---|
15 | | - | when the individual dies; and |
---|
16 | | - | (2) the residence homestead of the individual: |
---|
17 | | - | (A) is the residence homestead of the surviving |
---|
18 | | - | spouse on the date that the individual dies; and |
---|
19 | | - | (B) remains the residence homestead of the |
---|
20 | | - | surviving spouse. |
---|
21 | | - | (i-1) A limitation under Subsection (i) applicable to the |
---|
22 | | - | residence homestead of the surviving spouse of an individual who |
---|
23 | | - | was disabled and who died before January 1, 2020, is calculated as |
---|
24 | | - | if the surviving spouse was entitled to the limitation when the |
---|
25 | | - | individual died. |
---|
26 | | - | SECTION 2. Section 23.01(e), Tax Code, is amended to read as |
---|
| 16 | + | SECTION 1. Section 23.01(e), Tax Code, is amended to read as |
---|
27 | 17 | | follows: |
---|
28 | 18 | | (e) Notwithstanding any provision of this subchapter to the |
---|
29 | 19 | | contrary, if the appraised value of property in a tax year is |
---|
30 | 20 | | lowered under Subtitle F, the appraised value of the property as |
---|
31 | 21 | | finally determined under that subtitle is considered to be the |
---|
32 | 22 | | appraised value of the property for that tax year. In the next |
---|
33 | 23 | | [following] tax year in which the property is appraised, the chief |
---|
34 | 24 | | appraiser may not increase the appraised value of the property |
---|
35 | 25 | | unless the increase by the chief appraiser is reasonably supported |
---|
36 | 26 | | by clear and convincing [substantial] evidence when all of the |
---|
37 | 27 | | reliable and probative evidence in the record is considered as a |
---|
38 | 28 | | whole. If the appraised value is finally determined in a protest |
---|
39 | 29 | | under Section 41.41(a)(2) or an appeal under Section 42.26, the |
---|
40 | 30 | | chief appraiser may satisfy the requirement to reasonably support |
---|
41 | 31 | | by clear and convincing [substantial] evidence an increase in the |
---|
42 | 32 | | appraised value of the property in the next [following] tax year in |
---|
43 | 33 | | which the property is appraised by presenting evidence showing that |
---|
44 | 34 | | the inequality in the appraisal of property has been corrected with |
---|
45 | 35 | | regard to the properties that were considered in determining the |
---|
46 | 36 | | value of the subject property. The burden of proof is on the chief |
---|
47 | 37 | | appraiser to support an increase in the appraised value of property |
---|
48 | 38 | | under the circumstances described by this subsection. |
---|
49 | | - | SECTION 3. Section 41.41, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
50 | | - | Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
51 | | - | (c) An appraisal district or the appraisal review board for |
---|
52 | | - | an appraisal district may not require a property owner to pay a fee |
---|
53 | | - | in connection with a protest filed by the owner with the board. |
---|
54 | | - | SECTION 4. This Act applies only to a tax year beginning on |
---|
55 | | - | or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
56 | | - | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect January 1, 2020. |
---|
57 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
58 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
59 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1313 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
60 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
61 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
62 | | - | H.B. No. 1313 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
63 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
64 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
65 | | - | on H.B. No. 1313 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143, |
---|
66 | | - | Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
67 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
69 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1313 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
70 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
71 | | - | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
72 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
73 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
74 | | - | 1313 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
75 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
76 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
77 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
78 | | - | Date |
---|
79 | | - | __________________ |
---|
80 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 39 | + | SECTION 2. This Act applies only to the appraisal of |
---|
| 40 | + | property for a tax year beginning on or after the effective date of |
---|
| 41 | + | this Act. |
---|
| 42 | + | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2020. |
---|
| 43 | + | * * * * * |
---|