Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1313 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            H.B. No. 1313


 AN ACT
 relating to ad valorem taxation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.26, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsection (i) and adding Subsection (i-1) to read as follows:
 (i)  If an individual who qualifies for the exemption
 provided by Section 11.13(c) [for an individual 65 years of age or
 older] dies, the surviving spouse of the individual is entitled to
 the limitation applicable to the residence homestead of the
 individual if:
 (1)  the surviving spouse is 55 years of age or older
 when the individual dies; and
 (2)  the residence homestead of the individual:
 (A)  is the residence homestead of the surviving
 spouse on the date that the individual dies; and
 (B)  remains the residence homestead of the
 surviving spouse.
 (i-1)  A limitation under Subsection (i) applicable to the
 residence homestead of the surviving spouse of an individual who
 was disabled and who died before January 1, 2020, is calculated as
 if the surviving spouse was entitled to the limitation when the
 individual died.
 SECTION 2.  Section 23.01(e), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding any provision of this subchapter to the
 contrary, if the appraised value of property in a tax year is
 lowered under Subtitle F, the appraised value of the property as
 finally determined under that subtitle is considered to be the
 appraised value of the property for that tax year.  In the next
 [following] tax year in which the property is appraised, the chief
 appraiser may not increase the appraised value of the property
 unless the increase by the chief appraiser is reasonably supported
 by clear and convincing [substantial] evidence when all of the
 reliable and probative evidence in the record is considered as a
 whole. If the appraised value is finally determined in a protest
 under Section 41.41(a)(2) or an appeal under Section 42.26, the
 chief appraiser may satisfy the requirement to reasonably support
 by clear and convincing [substantial] evidence an increase in the
 appraised value of the property in the next [following] tax year in
 which the property is appraised by presenting evidence showing that
 the inequality in the appraisal of property has been corrected with
 regard to the properties that were considered in determining the
 value of the subject property.  The burden of proof is on the chief
 appraiser to support an increase in the appraised value of property
 under the circumstances described by this subsection.
 SECTION 3.  Section 41.41, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  An appraisal district or the appraisal review board for
 an appraisal district may not require a property owner to pay a fee
 in connection with a protest filed by the owner with the board.
 SECTION 4.  This Act applies only to a tax year beginning on
 or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2020.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1313 was passed by the House on May 3,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1313 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1313 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1313 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1313 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor