House
|
04/29/2019
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Companion considered in lieu of SB 319
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Postponed 4/29/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Postponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Postponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Postponed 4/15/19 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2019
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|