Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | ||
1 | + | 86R8180 SOS-D | |
2 | 2 | By: Talarico H.B. No. 1468 | |
3 | - | Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1468: | |
4 | - | By: Bernal C.S.H.B. No. 1468 | |
5 | 3 | ||
6 | 4 | ||
7 | 5 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
8 | 6 | AN ACT | |
9 | 7 | relating to the creation of a task force to examine the | |
10 | - | effectiveness of school | |
11 | - | ||
8 | + | effectiveness of school counseling programs provided for students | |
9 | + | enrolled in public schools. | |
12 | 10 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
13 | 11 | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is | |
14 | 12 | amended by adding Section 38.038 to read as follows: | |
15 | 13 | Sec. 38.038. PUBLIC SCHOOL MENTAL HEALTH TASK FORCE; | |
16 | 14 | REPORT. (a) In this section: | |
17 | 15 | (1) "Public school chief executive officer" means the | |
18 | 16 | superintendent of a school district or the chief executive officer | |
19 | 17 | of an open-enrollment charter school. | |
20 | 18 | (2) "Public school mental health professional" means a | |
21 | 19 | person who provides counseling services in a public school and is: | |
22 | - | (A) a licensed physician who is: | |
20 | + | (A) a counselor certified under Subchapter B, | |
21 | + | Chapter 21; | |
22 | + | (B) a licensed physician who is: | |
23 | 23 | (i) a graduate of an accredited psychiatric | |
24 | 24 | residency training program; or | |
25 | 25 | (ii) certified in psychiatry by: | |
26 | 26 | (a) the American Board of Psychiatry | |
27 | 27 | and Neurology; or | |
28 | 28 | (b) the American Osteopathic Board of | |
29 | 29 | Neurology and Psychiatry; | |
30 | - | ( | |
30 | + | (C) an advanced practice registered nurse, as | |
31 | 31 | defined by Section 301.152, Occupations Code, who holds a | |
32 | 32 | nationally recognized board certification in psychiatric or mental | |
33 | 33 | health nursing; | |
34 | - | ( | |
34 | + | (D) a psychologist, as defined by Section | |
35 | 35 | 501.002, Occupations Code; | |
36 | - | ( | |
36 | + | (E) a licensed professional counselor, as | |
37 | 37 | defined by Section 503.002, Occupations Code; or | |
38 | - | ( | |
38 | + | (F) a licensed clinical social worker, as defined | |
39 | 39 | by Section 505.002, Occupations Code. | |
40 | 40 | (b) The Public School Mental Health task force is | |
41 | 41 | established under this section to examine the effectiveness of | |
42 | - | school | |
43 | - | ||
42 | + | school counseling programs provided for students enrolled in public | |
43 | + | schools. | |
44 | 44 | (c) The task force is composed of the following 25 members | |
45 | 45 | appointed by the commissioner: | |
46 | - | (1) five school counselors certified under Subchapter | |
47 | - | B, Chapter 21; | |
48 | - | (2) one director of a public school counseling | |
49 | - | program; | |
50 | - | (3) four public school mental health professionals; | |
51 | - | (4) five public school chief executive officers; | |
52 | - | (5) four representatives of regional education | |
46 | + | (1) 10 public school mental health professionals; | |
47 | + | (2) five public school chief executive officers; | |
48 | + | (3) four representatives of regional education | |
53 | 49 | service centers who have experience with school counseling; | |
54 | - | ( | |
50 | + | (4) one representative of the State Board of | |
55 | 51 | Education; | |
56 | - | ( | |
57 | - | ( | |
52 | + | (5) one representative of the agency; | |
53 | + | (6) two representatives of professional counseling | |
58 | 54 | organizations; and | |
59 | - | ( | |
55 | + | (7) two representatives of research organizations | |
60 | 56 | that have conducted academic research on school counseling. | |
61 | 57 | (d) The commissioner shall appoint the members of the task | |
62 | 58 | force not later than December 31, 2020. The commissioner shall fill | |
63 | 59 | a vacancy in the task force by the appointment of another person | |
64 | 60 | with the same qualifications as the original appointee. | |
65 | 61 | (e) The representative of the agency shall serve as the | |
66 | 62 | presiding officer of the task force. | |
67 | 63 | (f) The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of | |
68 | 64 | the task force on or before January 31, 2021. The task force shall | |
69 | 65 | meet at least twice each year in Austin, Texas, and at other times | |
70 | 66 | and places that the presiding officer determines are appropriate. | |
71 | 67 | (g) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the | |
72 | 68 | task force. | |
73 | 69 | (h) The task force shall: | |
74 | - | (1) examine the types of mental health services that | |
75 | - | public schools provide; | |
70 | + | (1) examine whether public schools are using school | |
71 | + | counseling programs, including the national framework developed by | |
72 | + | the American School Counselor Association; | |
76 | 73 | (2) examine other existing measures used by schools | |
77 | 74 | that positively affect student mental health; | |
78 | - | (3) determine which school | |
75 | + | (3) determine which school counseling programs | |
79 | 76 | achieve the best performance, considering the cost of the program, | |
80 | 77 | the number of students served, and the effectiveness of the | |
81 | 78 | program; | |
82 | - | (4) determine which school | |
79 | + | (4) determine which school counseling programs | |
83 | 80 | schools prefer to use; and | |
84 | 81 | (5) conduct a statistical analysis, incorporating | |
85 | 82 | information on student demographics, including student family | |
86 | 83 | average income, to determine the overall effectiveness of school | |
87 | - | | |
84 | + | counseling programs and the impact on student achievement and | |
88 | 85 | performance. | |
89 | 86 | (i) Not later than August 31, 2022, the task force shall | |
90 | 87 | deliver a report to the commissioner detailing the task force's | |
91 | 88 | findings and recommendations and the results of the statistical | |
92 | 89 | analysis conducted by the task force. | |
93 | 90 | (j) The task force is abolished, and this section expires, | |
94 | 91 | December 1, 2022. | |
95 | 92 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |