86R23971 SOS-D By: Talarico H.B. No. 1468 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1468: By: Bernal C.S.H.B. No. 1468 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of a task force to examine the effectiveness of school mental health programs provided for students enrolled in public schools. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 38.038 to read as follows: Sec. 38.038. PUBLIC SCHOOL MENTAL HEALTH TASK FORCE; REPORT. (a) In this section: (1) "Public school chief executive officer" means the superintendent of a school district or the chief executive officer of an open-enrollment charter school. (2) "Public school mental health professional" means a person who provides counseling services in a public school and is: (A) a licensed physician who is: (i) a graduate of an accredited psychiatric residency training program; or (ii) certified in psychiatry by: (a) the American Board of Psychiatry and Neurology; or (b) the American Osteopathic Board of Neurology and Psychiatry; (B) an advanced practice registered nurse, as defined by Section 301.152, Occupations Code, who holds a nationally recognized board certification in psychiatric or mental health nursing; (C) a psychologist, as defined by Section 501.002, Occupations Code; (D) a licensed professional counselor, as defined by Section 503.002, Occupations Code; or (E) a licensed clinical social worker, as defined by Section 505.002, Occupations Code. (b) The Public School Mental Health task force is established under this section to examine the effectiveness of school mental health programs provided for students enrolled in public schools. (c) The task force is composed of the following 25 members appointed by the commissioner: (1) five school counselors certified under Subchapter B, Chapter 21; (2) one director of a public school counseling program; (3) four public school mental health professionals; (4) five public school chief executive officers; (5) four representatives of regional education service centers who have experience with school counseling; (6) one representative of the State Board of Education; (7) one representative of the agency; (8) two representatives of professional counseling organizations; and (9) two representatives of research organizations that have conducted academic research on school counseling. (d) The commissioner shall appoint the members of the task force not later than December 31, 2020. The commissioner shall fill a vacancy in the task force by the appointment of another person with the same qualifications as the original appointee. (e) The representative of the agency shall serve as the presiding officer of the task force. (f) The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of the task force on or before January 31, 2021. The task force shall meet at least twice each year in Austin, Texas, and at other times and places that the presiding officer determines are appropriate. (g) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the task force. (h) The task force shall: (1) examine the types of mental health services that public schools provide; (2) examine other existing measures used by schools that positively affect student mental health; (3) determine which school mental health programs achieve the best performance, considering the cost of the program, the number of students served, and the effectiveness of the program; (4) determine which school mental health programs schools prefer to use; and (5) conduct a statistical analysis, incorporating information on student demographics, including student family average income, to determine the overall effectiveness of school mental health programs and the impact on student achievement and performance. (i) Not later than August 31, 2022, the task force shall deliver a report to the commissioner detailing the task force's findings and recommendations and the results of the statistical analysis conducted by the task force. (j) The task force is abolished, and this section expires, December 1, 2022. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.