Senate | 05/22/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Record vote RV#209 | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Filed |