Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1506 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/30/2019

                            By: Perez, González of Dallas H.B. No. 1506
 (Senate Sponsor - Johnson)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
 Rural Affairs; April 30, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1; April 30, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing a regulatory authority to establish reduced
 water and sewer utility rates funded by donations for the benefit of
 certain low-income customers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.182, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b-1) and adding Subsection (b-2) to read as
 follows:
 (b-1)  In establishing a utility's rates, the regulatory
 authority may authorize the utility to establish reduced water and
 sewer rates for a minimal level of service to be provided solely to
 a class of [elderly] customers who are 65 years of age or older, who
 receive medical assistance under the medical assistance program
 established under Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, or who receive
 benefits under the supplemental nutrition assistance program
 established under Chapter 33, Human Resources Code, to ensure that
 those customers receive that level of service at more affordable
 rates.  The regulatory authority may establish requirements for
 determining the eligibility of customers to receive reduced rates
 under this subsection.
 (b-2)  The regulatory authority shall allow a utility to
 establish a fund to receive donations to recover the costs of
 providing the reduced rates under Subsection (b-1).  A utility may
 not recover those costs through charges to the utility's other
 customer classes.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The changes in law made by this Act to
 Section 13.182, Water Code, apply only to proceedings before a
 regulatory authority regarding rates concerning an application
 filed on or after January 1, 2020. Proceedings before a regulatory
 authority regarding rates concerning an application filed before
 January 1, 2020, are governed by the law in effect when the
 application was filed, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 (b)  The Public Utility Commission of Texas and other
 regulatory authorities shall adopt rules as necessary to implement
 the changes in law made by this Act not later than December 31,
 2019.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *