Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1515 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/14/2019

                            86R7641 KKR-D
 By: Nevárez H.B. No. 1515


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation and functions of the State Office of
 Risk Management.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 412, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 412.013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 412.013.  REVIEW AND UPDATE OF RISK MANAGEMENT PROGRAM
 GUIDELINES. (a) In administering the guidelines for a
 comprehensive risk management program under Section 412.011(b)(4),
 the office must:
 (1)  at least biennially review the guidelines to
 determine whether they are appropriate and current; and
 (2)  at least every five years, update the guidelines
 to be consistent with up-to-date industry best practices and
 current law.
 (b)  In updating the guidelines under Subsection (a)(2), the
 office must solicit feedback from state entities concerning topics
 for inclusion in the guidelines and ways for making the guidelines
 more user-friendly.
 SECTION 2.  Section 412.021(f), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (f)  The risk management board and the office are subject to
 Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued
 in existence as provided by that chapter, the board is abolished and
 this section expires September 1, 2031 [2019].
 SECTION 3.  Section 412.022, Labor Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The [A] training program [established under this
 section] must provide the board member with information [to the
 member] regarding:
 (1)  the law governing [enabling legislation that
 created the office and] the office's operations;
 (2)  the programs, functions, rules, and budget of the
 office;
 (3)  the scope of and limitations on the rulemaking
 authority of the board;
 (4) [(2)]  the results of the most recent formal audit
 of the office;
 (5) [(3)]  the requirements of:
 (A)  laws relating to open meetings, public
 information, administrative procedure, and disclosing conflicts of
 interest; and
 (B)  other laws applicable to members of a state
 policymaking body in performing their duties; and
 (6) [(4)]  any applicable ethics policies adopted by
 the office or the Texas Ethics Commission.
 (d)  The director of the office shall create a training
 manual that includes the information required by Subsection (b).
 The director shall distribute a copy of the training manual
 annually to each member of the board. Each member of the board
 shall sign and submit to the director a statement acknowledging
 that the member received and has reviewed the training manual.
 SECTION 4.  Section 412.053(b), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The information shall be reported not later than the
 60th day after [before] the last day of each fiscal year.
 SECTION 5.  Notwithstanding the time periods prescribed by
 Section 412.013, Labor Code, as added by this Act, the State Office
 of Risk Management shall review and update the guidelines adopted
 by the risk management board under Section 412.011(b)(4), Labor
 Code, not later than September 1, 2020.
 SECTION 6.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, Section 412.022, Labor Code, as amended by this Act,
 applies to a member of the risk management board appointed before,
 on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 (b)  A member of the risk management board who, before the
 effective date of this Act, completed the training program required
 by Section 412.022, Labor Code, as that law existed before the
 effective date of this Act, is required to complete additional
 training only on subjects added by this Act to the training program
 as required by Section 412.022, Labor Code, as amended by this Act.
 A board member described by this subsection may not vote,
 deliberate, or be counted as a member in attendance at a meeting of
 the board held on or after December 1, 2019, until the member
 completes the additional training.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.