Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Record vote RV#1258
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2019
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|