Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1644 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/28/2019

                            86R28873 JTS-F
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 1644
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1644:
 By:  Bernal C.S.H.B. No. 1644


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional
 mobility authority comprehensive development agreements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 223.201(b), Transportation Code, is
 redesignated as Section 223.2001, Transportation Code, and amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2001.  DEFINITION.  [(b)] In this subchapter,
 "comprehensive development agreement" means an agreement that, at a
 minimum, provides for the design and construction, reconstruction,
 rehabilitation, expansion, or improvement of a project described in
 Section 223.201(a) [Subsection (a)] and may also provide for the
 financing, acquisition, maintenance, or operation of a project
 described in that section [Subsection (a)].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 223.2002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2002.  LIMITATION. The department may enter into a
 comprehensive development agreement only for specific projects
 authorized under this subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  Section 223.201(f), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  The department may enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement [only] for all or part of[:
 [(1)]  the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project[;
 [(2)     the Interstate Highway 35E managed lanes project
 in Dallas and Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S.
 Highway 380;
 [(3)     the Interstate Highway 35W project in Tarrant
 County from Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114;
 [(4)     the State Highway 183 managed lanes project in
 Tarrant and Dallas Counties from State Highway 121 to Interstate
 Highway 35E;
 [(5)     the Interstate Highway 35E/U.S. Highway 67
 Southern Gateway project in Dallas County, including:
 [(A)     Interstate Highway 35E from 8th Street to
 Interstate Highway 20; and
 [(B)     U.S. Highway 67 from Interstate Highway 35E
 to Farm-to-Market Road 1382 (Belt Line Road);
 [(6)     the State Highway 288 project from U.S. Highway
 59 to south of State Highway 6 in Brazoria County and Harris County;
 [(7)     the U.S. Highway 290 managed lanes project in
 Harris County from Interstate Highway 610 to State Highway 99;
 [(8)     the Interstate Highway 820 project from State
 Highway 183 to Randol Mill Road;
 [(9)     the State Highway 114 project in Dallas County
 from State Highway 121 to State Highway 183;
 [(10)     the Loop 12 project in Dallas County from State
 Highway 183 to Interstate Highway 35E;
 [(11)     the Loop 9 project in Dallas and Ellis Counties
 from Interstate Highway 20 to U.S. Highway 67; and
 [(12)     the U.S. Highway 181 Harbor Bridge project in
 Nueces County between U.S. Highway 181 at Beach Avenue and
 Interstate Highway 37].
 SECTION 4.  Section 223.2012(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, the North Tarrant Express project is
 the project on Interstate Highway 35W in Tarrant County from
 Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114 that was [described by
 Section 223.201(f)(3)] entered into on June 23, 2009.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 223.2014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2014.  AUTHORIZED PROJECTS. (a) The department
 may enter into a comprehensive development agreement for:
 (1)  the Interstate Highway 45 North project in Harris
 County from Beltway 8 to Interstate Highway 10;
 (2)  the Hempstead Managed Tollway project in Harris
 County from State Highway 99 to the Interstate Highway
 610/Interstate Highway 10 interchange;
 (3)  the Interstate Highway 30 project in Tarrant
 County from Interstate Highway 35W to east of Fielder Road;
 (4)  the Interstate Highway 35E project in Dallas and
 Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S. Highway 380;
 and
 (5)  a project listed under Section 370.3051.
 (b)  The department may combine in a comprehensive
 development agreement:
 (1)  two or more projects authorized in this section;
 or
 (2)  a project authorized in this section and a
 facility under Chapter 91.
 (c)  This section expires August 31, 2029.
 SECTION 6.  Section 223.202, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.202.  LIMITATION ON [DEPARTMENT] FINANCIAL
 PARTICIPATION. (a) The [amount of money disbursed by the]
 department may not disburse money from the state highway fund or
 [and] the Texas mobility fund [during a federal fiscal year] to pay
 all or part of the actual cost of construction for a project
 developed [the costs] under a comprehensive development agreement
 [agreements may not exceed 40 percent of the obligation authority
 under the federal-aid highway program that is distributed to this
 state for that fiscal year].
 (b)  This section does not preclude the expenditure of funds
 by the department, or the disbursement of funds by the department to
 another governmental entity, for activities related to a project
 ultimately developed under a comprehensive development agreement,
 including:
 (1)  environmental review;
 (2)  right-of-way acquisition;
 (3)  traffic estimates;
 (4)  preliminary engineering;
 (5)  feasibility studies; and
 (6)  necessary or incidental administrative, legal,
 and other expenses.
 SECTION 7.  Section 223.208, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  Notwithstanding Subsection (h), a comprehensive
 development agreement entered into on or before March 22, 2007, for
 State Highway 130 from U.S. Highway 183 to Interstate Highway 10
 (Segments 5 and 6) may be amended at the discretion of the
 department to extend the duration of the agreement and other
 agreement terms if the amendment outlines the financial and other
 benefits the state will receive from each amendment. The amendment
 must require the private participant to:
 (1)  design, finance, and cause to be constructed a
 non-tolled connector between Interstate Highway 35 and State
 Highway 130 that will be owned by the state; and
 (2)  competitively procure the construction of the
 connector described in Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 8.  Section 370.305(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  An authority may enter into a comprehensive development
 agreement only for specific projects authorized under this
 subchapter [Except as provided by this chapter, an authority's
 authority to enter into a comprehensive development agreement
 expires on August 31, 2011].
 SECTION 9.  Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 370.3051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 370.3051.  AUTHORIZED PROJECTS FOR COMPREHENSIVE
 DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS. (a) A regional mobility authority may
 enter into a comprehensive development agreement for:
 (1)  the Interstate Highway 35 Northeast Expansion
 project, from Loop 410 South in Bexar County to Farm-to-Market Road
 1103 in Comal County;
 (2)  the Loop 1604 project in Bexar County;
 (3)  the Outer Parkway project in Cameron County from
 U.S. Highway 77 to Farm-to-Market Road 1847;
 (4)  the South Padre Island Second Access Causeway
 project in Cameron County from State Highway 100 to Park Road 100;
 (5)  the Farm-to-Market 1925 project from U.S. Highway
 281 in Hidalgo County to U.S. Highway 77 in Cameron County;
 (6)  the Hidalgo County Loop project;
 (7)  the International Bridge Trade Corridor project in
 Hidalgo County;
 (8)  the State Highway 68 project in Hidalgo County;
 (9)  the Interstate Highway 35 project in Travis and
 Williamson Counties from Ranch-to-Market Road 1431 to State Highway
 45 Southeast;
 (10)  the Loop 1 South project in Travis County from
 Cesar Chavez Street to Slaughter Lane; and
 (11)  the Loop 49 project from State Highway 110 in
 Smith County to U.S. Highway 259 in Gregg County (Segments 6 and 7).
 (b)  This section expires August 31, 2029.
 SECTION 10.  The following provisions of the Transportation
 Code are repealed:
 (1)  Sections 223.201(g), (i), (j), (k), (l), and (m);
 and
 (2)  Section 223.2011.
 SECTION 11.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.